Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sysco San Francisco Inc.,, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook, David Julian, against Does 1 Thru X, Incl., That'S It, Inc, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time631 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint document in a legal case. The case number is CGC-12-520228 and it was filed by Wesley G. Ramirez on May 17, 2012. The plaintiff is SYSCO San Francisco, Inc. and the defendant/respondent is...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 23, 2012DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THRU X, INCL.
Date: July 09, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2014 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-29-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN MATEO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT THAT'S IT, INC DBA LIME RESTAURANT | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT THAT'S IT, INC DBA LIME RESTAURANT $5,724.85 PRINCIPAL, $900.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $722.20 INTEREST, $345.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,692.05, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $345.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT THAT'S IT, INC DBA LIME RESTAURANT | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAVID J. COOK ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; CALCULATION OF INTEREST; DECLARATION RE COSTS; W/ATTACHED CREDIT APPLICATION, LETTER FROM COLLECTION AGENCY AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
October 23, 2013 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT THAT'S IT, INC DBA LIME RESTAURANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.