Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lesiewski, Jack, Navarro, Juan Carlos, Vasquez, Juan Guy, Williams, Charles, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Berko, Daniel, Von Loewenfeldt, Michael, against Comcast Cable Communications Management Llc, Comcast Corporation, Does 1 To 60, Inclusive, Does 3-60, Inclusive, Freeman, Forrest Craig, (total of 7) See All represented by Landy, Daryl Steven, Levins, Alan Sam, Thompson, Charles Oliver, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John E. Munter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn E. Munter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management241 days |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2010 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time1662 days |
This complaint is a second amended complaint filed by plaintiffs Jack Lesiewski, Juan Guy Vasquez, Charles Williams, and Juan Carlos Navarro against defendants O.C. Communications, Inc., Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC, Forrest Craig Free...
PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55426865)
Date: May 09, 2014MINUTES FOR SEP-18-2014 1:30 PM
Date: September 18, 2014NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY THOMPSON, CHARLES OLIVER
Date: October 10, 2012MINUTES FOR DEC-06-2011 3:00 PM FOR DEPT 305
Date: December 06, 2011MINUTES FOR MAR-07-2013 4:00 PM
Date: March 07, 2013NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 01, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT O.C. COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Date: April 22, 2010ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT O.C. COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Date: July 23, 2010ORDER - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 28, 2010ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2011ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT O.C. COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Date: July 21, 2011NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFFS (TRANSACTION ID # 50011259)
Date: March 08, 2013ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 55496061)
Date: May 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR SEP-18-2014 1:30 PM | |
September 18, 2014 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS
Judge: JOHN E. MUNTER |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | MATTER IS SUBMITTED AND RULED UPON IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE JOHN MUNTER, CLERK DANIAL LEMIRE, REPORTER TAMARA WILLAT CSR #4605. | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT RE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 56032645) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LESIEWSKI, JACK ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VASQUEZ, JUAN GUY ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERSA SIMILARILY SITUATED WILLIAMS, CHARLES NAVARRO, JUAN CARLOS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56032645) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LESIEWSKI, JACK ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VASQUEZ, JUAN GUY ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERSA SIMILARILY SITUATED WILLIAMS, CHARLES NAVARRO, JUAN CARLOS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BERNELLA OSTERLUND RE DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS (TRANSACTION ID # 56032645) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LESIEWSKI, JACK ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VASQUEZ, JUAN GUY ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERSA SIMILARILY SITUATED WILLIAMS, CHARLES NAVARRO, JUAN CARLOS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 55592495) FILED BY ATTORNEY VON LOEWENFELDT, MICHAEL | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 55496061) | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-14-2014 HELD AND CONTINUED TO SEP-18-2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 305 UPON STIPULATION OF COUNSEL. NOTICE WAIVED. JUDGE: JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK: CRAIG BLACKSTONE; REPORTER: MELINDA MARTIN, CSR 240, TEL: (559) 636-1306. | |
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED 2ND REPORT RE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION AND CLASS COUNSELS RECOMMENDATION (TRANSACTION ID # 55480319) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LESIEWSKI, JACK ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VASQUEZ, JUAN GUY ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERSA SIMILARILY SITUATED WILLIAMS, CHARLES NAVARRO, JUAN CARLOS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.