Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Naik, Sudhir D., Waasdorp, Leo, filed a(n) General Securities - Securities case represented by Browning, Nichole, Peterson, Erik D., Zagar, Eric L., against Aldinger, William F., Allen, Jay L., Bechtle, Nancy H., Bettinger Ii, Walter W., Brigeman, Benjamin L., (total of 14) See All represented by Haky, Lowell H, Serota, Gilbert Ross, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John E. Munter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn E. Munter Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2010 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1832 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Securities |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1832 days |
This complaint is a shareholder derivative action brought against The Charles Schwab Corporation and certain of its current and former officers and directors. The plaintiffs allege that the individual defendants breached their fiduciary duties by all...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER CORRECTED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; ORDER THEREON (TRANSACTION #56859156) | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | FEE PAID FOR REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON (TRANSACTION ID # 56733796) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAIK, SUDHIR D. ,DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANT THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION WAASDORP, LEO DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDNT THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #497166) | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CORRECTED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON (TRANSACTION ID # 56736813) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAIK, SUDHIR D. ,DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANT THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION WAASDORP, LEO DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDNT THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #497166) | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ERIC L. ZAGAR IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56733796) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAIK, SUDHIR D. ,DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANT THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION WAASDORP, LEO DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDNT THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #497166) | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ERIC L. ZAGAR IN SUPPORT OF CORRECTED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56736813) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAIK, SUDHIR D. ,DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDANT THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION WAASDORP, LEO DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINAL DEFENDNT THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #497166) | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER REASSIGNING CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES (TRANSACTION ID # 56520213) | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6 (TRANSACTION ID # 56476544) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCHWAB, CHARLES R. BETTINGER II, WALTER W. ALLEN, JAY L. BRIGEMAN, BENJAMIN L. DWYER, CARRIE E. ALDINGER, WILLIAM F. BECHTLE, NANCY H. BUTCHER, C. PRESTON HERRINGER, FRANK C. MCLIN, STEPHEN T. SNEED, PAULA A. WALTHER, ROGER O. WILSON, ROBERT N. | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF GILBERT R. SEROTA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6 (TRANSACTION ID # 56476544) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCHWAB, CHARLES R. BETTINGER II, WALTER W. ALLEN, JAY L. BRIGEMAN, BENJAMIN L. DWYER, CARRIE E. ALDINGER, WILLIAM F. BECHTLE, NANCY H. BUTCHER, C. PRESTON HERRINGER, FRANK C. MCLIN, STEPHEN T. SNEED, PAULA A. WALTHER, ROGER O. WILSON, ROBERT N. | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - GENERAL ORDER RE CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56435761) | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - AUTHORIZATION TO RE-ASSIGN CASES AND PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 56435705) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.