Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Worldwide Asset Purcasing, Ii, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Does I Thru X Incl., Tang, Anna, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions181 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time729 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCASING, II, LLC | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCASING, II, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TANG, ANNA AKA ANNA L. TANG AKA ANNA L. YUK $15,244.67 PRINCIPAL, $2,796.42 INTEREST, $375.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $18,416.09, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES I THRU X INCL. | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCASING, II, LLC | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RORY W. CLARK RE: INTEREST COMPUTATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCASING, II, LLC | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES AND INTEREST IN EXCESS OF TEN PERCENT AND ELECTION TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCASING, II, LLC | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION AS TO MONIES OWING PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585 IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY; UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINAL WRITTEN OBLIGATION EXECUTED BY DEFENDANT; DECLARATION RE: LOST OR STOLEN CREDIT CARD FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCASING, II, LLC | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, COURT JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $375.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT TANG, ANNA AKA ANNA L. TANG AKA ANNA L. YUK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.