Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, Davis, Iii, Shedrick O., against Does 1 To 10, Hester, John N., represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2008 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time744 days |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: September 29, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HESTER, JOHN
Date: February 05, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT HESTER, JOHN N. | |
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | COST BILL, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $178.75 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION | |
November 06, 2009 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT HESTER, JOHN N. | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION | |
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-06-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT HESTER, JOHN N. $27,504.71 PRINCIPAL, $4,684.09 INTEREST, $433.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $32,621.80, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
September 21, 2009 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR SHORT CAUSE
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.