Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing, Ii,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Does 1 Through X, Inclusive, Hong, Chow, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2008 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions156 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1066 days |
REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT HONG, CHOW
Date: May 14, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 29, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
August 29, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF AUG-29-2008, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
August 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II,LLC | |
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II,LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT HONG, CHOW $11,325.93 PRINCIPAL, $1,311.30 INTEREST, $360.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $12,997.23, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH X, INCLUSIVE | |
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT ** AMENDED PROOF ** FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II,LLC SERVED FEB-12-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT HONG, CHOW | |
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE WAIVER OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% AND ELECTION TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO ACCOUNT STATED FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II,LLC | |
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION AS TO MONIES OWING PURSUANT TO CCP 585D IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY; UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINAL WRITTEN OBLIGATION EXECUTED BY DEFENDANT; DECLARATION RE: LOST OR STOLEN CREDIT CARD FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II,LLC | |
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, II,LLC AS TO DEFENDANT HONG, CHOW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.