Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Does 1 Through X, Inclusive, Perry, Stephen J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2008 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions262 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1066 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH X, INCLUSIVE
Date: October 17, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING,LLC | |
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING,LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PERRY, STEPHEN J. AKA STEPHEN PERRY $8,079.29 PRINCIPAL, $1,120.47 INTEREST, $240.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $9,439.76, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH X, INCLUSIVE | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING,LLC SERVED APR-16-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT PERRY, STEPHEN J. AKA STEPHEN PERRY | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $240.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT PERRY, STEPHEN J. AKA STEPHEN PERRY | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RORY W. CLARK FILED RE: STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING,LLC | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RORY W. CLARK FILED RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES AND INTEREST IN EXCESS OF TEN PERCENT (10%) AND ELECTION TO PROCEED FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING,LLC | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT PERRY, STEPHEN J. AKA STEPHEN PERRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.