Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Does 1 Through X Inclusive, Pham, Cuong V, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2007 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1227 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH X INCLUSIVE
Date: December 11, 2007NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 21, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
March 21, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF MAR-21-2008, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC | |
December 21, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PHAM, CUONG V AKA CUONG VAN $11,565.43 PRINCIPAL, $1,248.98 INTEREST, $360.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $13,174.41, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH X INCLUSIVE | |
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC | |
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE UNAVAILABILITY OF DOCUMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC | |
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 585 IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY; UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINAL WRITTEN OBLIGATION; RE: LOST OR STOLEN CREDIT CARD FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.