Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, Davis, Iii, Shedrick O., against Does 1-10, Hassanein, Sal M, represented by Bovarnick, Steven Howard, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Nancy L. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy L. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2007 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time1396 days |
This complaint is in response to a complaint filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A. against Sal M. Hassanein and others. The complaint alleges that Hassanein owes money to Chase Bank. Hassanein denies each and every allegation of the complaint and asserts sev...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HASSANEIN, SAL M
Date: July 18, 2007MINUTES FOR APR-20-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: April 20, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION | |
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL ON APR-20-2009 OFF CALENDAR. SETTLEMENT IS REACHED AND STATED ON THE RECORD. STIPULATED JUDGMENT IS ENTERED. JUDGE NANCY L. DAVIS; CLERK NICOLE DAVIS; REPORTER LAURA MARTINEZ, CSR #11332. | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT HASSANEIN, SAL M $4,335.56 PRINCIPAL, $780.00 INTEREST, $221.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,336.56, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR APR-20-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 306 | |
April 20, 2009 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
April 20, 2009 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: NANCY L. DAVIS |
|
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF APR-20-2009 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON APR-20-2009 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 306, NANCY L DAVIS. TIME ESTIMATE FOR BOTH CASES: 1 HOUR. JUDGE: JAMES J. MCBRIDE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; REPORTER: JOE VICKSTEIN CSR #4780 (D206) | |
April 06, 2009 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR APR-06-2009 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR COURT ON APR-20-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN 206 TO BE HEARD ON SAME DATE AS CASE# 468645 (SAME PARTIES IN BOTH CASES.) NOTICE WAIVED BY PARTIES. JUDGE: JAMES J. MCBRIDE; CLERK: E. BURA; REPORTER: SARA LERSCHEN CSR# 6213 (206) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.