Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bykoff, Robert, filed a(n) Civil Rights case represented by Cole, Rufus L., against Cappelle, Carol, Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive, Groleau, Michelle, Groleau, Normand, Meridian Management Group, (total of 5) See All represented by Nelson, Rhonda L, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCivil Rights |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions501 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time517 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Robert Bykoff against Meridian Management Group, Normand Groleau, Michelle Groleau, Carol Cappelle, and Does 1 through 100. The complaint alleges violations of various statutes, including the Fair Housing A...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2008 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-17-2008 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT MERIDIAN MANAGEMENT GROUP GROLEAU, NORMAND INDIVIDUALLY AND AS OWNER OF TERRA VISTA APARTMENTS GROLEAU, MICHELLE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS OWNER OF TERRA VISTA APARTMENTS CAPPELLE, CAROL | |
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-15-2008 CONTINUED TO JUN-17-2008 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 15, 2008 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RUFUS L. COLE RE OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYKOFF, ROBERT INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 20108 FOR TRANSACTION W1408124J011 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO SEVERSON & WERSON, DOC #1901061907, WARRANT #38001663, DATED MAR-17-2008 | |
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 FOR TRANSACTION R1908115J009 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO RUFUS L. COLE, DOC #1901015979, TRUST TAG #20029, WARRANT #38001579, DATED FEB-25-2008 | |
February 11, 2008 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: DAVID BALLATI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.