Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Does 1-10, Inclusive, Gallant Jr, Roger, Gallant, Sharon, Stewart, Kimberly, White, Lisa, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Fishback, Stephen M., against All Asbestos Defendants, Amchem Products, Inc., American Asbestos Company, American Standard Inc., Asbestos Corporation Ltd., (total of 31) See All represented by Bassi, Marte Joseph, Biderman, David T., Brydon, John R, Fadeff, Jeffery John, Foley, Stephen J., (total of 16) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with David Ballati presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Ballati Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions284 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time763 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case is a personal injury, property damage, or wrongful death case involving the plaintiff Sharon Gallant and the defendant American Asbestos Company. The request for dismissal is directe...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18012250) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAP, INC.
Date: January 11, 2008DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 18012250) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAP, INC.
Date: January 11, 2008DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14874182) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: May 14, 2007NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 29, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14874182) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: May 14, 2007DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ; ENTIRE ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 18363692)
Date: January 30, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23539344) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. | |
April 16, 2008 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: DAVID BALLATI |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-16-2008. OFF CALENDAR. (206) | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18856620) AS TO DEFENDANT DAP PRODUCTS INC. | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18854945) AS TO DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18512302) AS TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18489657) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18487870) AS TO DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC. | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18476420) AS TO DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18476477) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN STANDARD INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.