Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, A New York Partnership, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Miele, Kenneth J., against Juan, Rouchel V, Vaquilar, Rouchel, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time718 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VAQUILAR, ROUCHEL SUED AS ROUCHEL JUAN
Date: February 13, 2007NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 29, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DEC-16-2008 AT 10:00AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 16, 2008 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-16-2008 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 212 | |
July 10, 2007 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-10-2007 CONTINUED TO DEC-16-2008 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 04, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JUL-10-2007 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. MAY-04-2007 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT JUAN, ROUCHEL V AKA ROUCHEL VAQUILAR AKA ROUCHEL Y. JUAN | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT JUAN, ROUCHEL V AKA ROUCHEL VAQUILAR AKA ROUCHEL Y. JUAN | |
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT JUAN, ROUCHEL V AKA ROUCHEL VAQUILAR AKA ROUCHEL Y. JUAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.