Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude, Raymond A., against Does 1 To 5, Inclusive, Herndon, Barbara A, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3832 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ON APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17176019) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK SERVED JUN-21-2017, MAIL AS TO DEFENDANT HERNDON, BARBARA A PROCESS COMPLETED BY DEFAULT SECTION. WRIT MAY ISSUE ON JUL-27-2017 IF NO MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC. 683.110 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT HERNDON, BARBARA A $2,368.56 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,368.56, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ALL FURTHER PROCESSING TO BE DONE BY DEFAULT SECTION | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17085027) | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $930.55 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 17085027) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17085027) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK AS TO DEFENDANT HERNDON, BARBARA A NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $716.04 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT HERNDON, BARBARA A | |
June 20, 2007 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF JUN-20-2007, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
May 04, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.