Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
George Ballard Company, A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Glassberg, Harold Burton, against Black, Ralph Raymond, Does 1-50 Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Everett Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEverett Hewlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions96 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time299 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE
Date: April 04, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEORGE BALLARD COMPANY, A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT BLACK, RALPH RAYMOND INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA RALPH BLACK CONSTRUCTION | |
October 02, 2007 | Hearing |
ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED
Judge: EVERETT HEWLETT |
|
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO RALPH RAYMOND BLACK, ON OCT-02-2007 OFF CALENDAR AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. | |
August 24, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER OF EXAMINATION FILED BY PLTF | |
August 13, 2007 | Hearing |
ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED
Judge: EVERETT HEWLETT |
|
August 13, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO RALPH RAYMOND BLACK, ON AUG-13-2007 CONTINUED TO OCT-02-2007 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 612. JUDGMENT DEBTOR SWORN AND EXAMINED. CREDITOR TO GIVE NOTICE. | |
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION; NOTICE TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT OEX FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEORGE BALLARD COMPANY, A CORPORATION SERVED MAY-21-2007, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BLACK, RALPH RAYMOND INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA RALPH BLACK CONSTRUCTION | |
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEORGE BALLARD COMPANY, A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT BLACK, RALPH RAYMOND INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA RALPH BLACK CONSTRUCTION OEX HEARING SET FOR AUG-13-2007 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 612 | |
May 04, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF GEORGE BALLARD COMPANY, A CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.