Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, Davis, Iii, Shedrick O., against Does 1 To 10, Perez, Alexander J., Perez, Alex J, represented by Dale, Joshua M, Perez, Alexander J., Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with James J. McBride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames J. McBride Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1038 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1520 days |
This complaint is filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., a corporation, against Alex J. Perez and other unknown defendants. The complaint alleges breach of contract, open book account, and account stated. Chase Bank states that it is a national bank authoriz...
MINUTES FOR SEP-08-2009 11:30 AM FOR DEPT 613
Date: September 08, 2009NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 01, 2006PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE JUL-05-2007.
Date: June 25, 2007ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PEREZ, ALEXANDER J.
Date: March 26, 2007PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE JUL-26-2007.
Date: July 16, 2007PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE AUG-23-2007.
Date: August 13, 2007NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION
Date: December 13, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $1,048.87 AS TO DEFENDANT PEREZ, ALEX J | |
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $451.53 INTEREST, $36.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION | |
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT PEREZ, ALEX J | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT PEREZ, ALEX J | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | COST BILL, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $230.28 INTEREST, $46.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PEREZ, ALEXANDER J. SUBSTITUTED FOR DALE, JOSHUA M AS ATTORNEY FOR PEREZ, ALEXANDER J. | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR SEP-08-2009 11:30 AM FOR DEPT 613 | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED; THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PEREZ, ALEX J $9,659.89 PRINCIPAL, $1,500.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $349.95 COSTS, $4,970.94 PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $16,480.78, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.