Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kirik, Dmitriy, Musiyenko, Vitality, Lai, Peter, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brady, Steven J, Del Bove, Brian A., against Does 1 To 25 Inclusive, Kirik, Dimitry, Kirik, Dmitry, Kirik, Iosif, Lai, Peter, (total of 5) See All represented by Horowitz, Michael A., Pabros, Steven, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2006 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions780 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time792 days |
This complaint, filed in the San Francisco Superior Court, is a cross-complaint in the case of Vitality Musiyenko vs. Iosif Kirik et al. The cross-complainant, Peter Lai, alleges three causes of action against the cross-defendants. The first cause of...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 18, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LAI, PETER
Date: October 20, 2006NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MUSIYENKO, VITALITY
Date: September 16, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KIRIK, IOSIF KIRIK, DMITRY
Date: October 18, 2006PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE APR-26-2007.
Date: April 16, 2007ORDER AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION TO OCT-25-2007
Date: August 22, 2007DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 06, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING NOV-18-2008 AT 10:00AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. CONSOLIDATED WITH #462135. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 18, 2008 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR NOV-18-2008 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 212 | |
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | PARTY/ATTORNEY FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #462135 ADDED TO LEAD CASE #456220 | |
October 06, 2008 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: DAVID BALLATI |
|
September 24, 2008 | Hearing |
MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR NOV-18-2008 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. SEP-24-2008 MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-06-2008 - BY COURT. | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-19-2008 - BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.