Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Hartmann, Christel H, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1758 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Worldwide Asset Purchasing, LLC against Christel H Hartmann and other unknown defendants. The case number is CGC-06-450123 and the filing date is March 8, 2006. The complaint alleges breach of a credit card...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT HARTMANN, CHRISTEL H AKA CHRISTEL HARTMANN | |
August 22, 2007 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT HARTMANN, CHRISTEL H AKA CHRISTEL HARTMANN | |
August 22, 2007 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,482.88 INTEREST, $35.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC | |
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC | |
July 07, 2006 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF JUL-07-2006, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS | |
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT HARTMANN, CHRISTEL H AKA CHRISTEL HARTMANN $10,815.58 PRINCIPAL, $1,773.04 INTEREST, $360.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $12,948.62, SEE SCANNED DOC ( MAILED) | |
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION AS TO MONIES OWING PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585 IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY; UNAVAILABILITY; UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINAL WRITTEN OBLIGATION EXECUTED BY DEFENDANT; DECLARATION RE: LOST OR STOLEN CREDIT CARD. FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.