Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garcia, Carlos, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Armendariz, Geraldine, against Coulson, Brooks, Does 1-X, Inclusive, Qzina Specialty Foods, Qzina Specialty Foods North America Inc, represented by Horowitz, Michael A., Keele, Christopher A., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2006 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions902 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1007 days |
This complaint is an amendment to an existing complaint filed by Carlos Garcia against Brooks Coulson and other unnamed defendants. The amendment is made to correct the use of a fictitious name for one of the defendants. The true name of the defendan...
PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE APR-19-2007.
Date: April 09, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT COULSON, BROOKS | |
August 25, 2008 | Hearing | MASTER CALENDAR JURY | |
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-25-2008 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED ON 7/7/08. (206) | |
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 20, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 16, 2008 | Hearing |
OBJECTION HEARING CALENDAR
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | OBJECTION HEARING OF MAY-16-2008 OFF CALENDAR - NO APPEARANCE (212) | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE REMOVED FROM PENDING TRIAL DE NOVO CALENDAR IF OBJECTION: HEARING SET FOR MAY-16-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 212 SET FOR JURY TRIAL ON AUG-25-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 | |
April 18, 2008 | Hearing |
TDN SWEEP
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 17, 2008 | Hearing |
CONT. ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.