Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Does I Through X, Inclusive, Finley, Charlene M., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2005 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1932 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
February 22, 2006 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF FEB-22-2006, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
January 13, 2006 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES I THROUGH X, INCLUSIVE | |
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FINLEY, CHARLENE M. AKA CHARLENE FINLEY $4,006.69 PRINCIPAL, $771.10 INTEREST, $216.30 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,994.09, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | RE ASSIGNMENT . FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC | |
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT . FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC | |
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $216.30 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT FINLEY, CHARLENE M. AKA CHARLENE FINLEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.