Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Archer, Darrell, Darquea, Keitha, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Does 1 To 5, Xxxxxxxx, Xxxxxxx V., Thompson, Angela, Roes 1-10, represented by Daniel V Kohls, Xxxxxxx V Xxxxxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shama Hakim Mesiwala presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShama Hakim Mesiwala Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Stip and Order - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (iso Motion) filed.
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:003DCA order dismissing appeal
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1) filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Department 27 Procedural Stipulations
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Court Memo - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Answer submitted by Archer, Darrell; Darquea, Keitha rejected on 06/07/2017 .
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike or Tax Costs filed.
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Proposed Judgment filed.
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to exclude any reference to Angela Thompson's earnings) filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Production of Docs) filed.
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint of xxxxxxxx Law) filed.
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Amendment to Motion to Tax) filed.
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 to exclude evidence of punitive damages) filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Trial Brief (Trial Facts) filed.
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other submitted by Archer, Darrell rejected on 11/14/2018 .
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/27/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 to exclude any evidence regarding billing by other attorneys) filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Motion for Non-Suit filed.
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/06/2018 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Motion - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Motion to Strike or Tax Costs) filed.
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Proposed Order filed.
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Statement of Case filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/04/2018 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Judgment on Verdict filed.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Witness List (Stipulation No. 1) filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Notice of Mtn and Mtn to Compel Production of Docs) filed.
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Request - Other (Granted Request for Telephonic Appearance) filed.
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:003DCA Remittitur on Appeal
Date: February 07, 2020Answer (to First Amended Compalint) filed.
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5 for plaintiffs to provide 24-hours notice of witnesses and documents) filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Stipulation No. 1
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's motion in limine #1 re: exclusion of evidence of punitive damages) filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Reply (in reponse to Defs opposition to Mtn to Compel.) filed.
Date: 2016-06-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other submitted by Archer, Darrell rejected on 11/05/2018 .
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order for Hearing held on 08/14/19 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 27.
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00P & A's - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00POS 010 - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00CMS - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Returned Mail - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00CMS - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Notice - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Declaration - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Receipt - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00ROA - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Notice - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Receipt - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Notice - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (sheet of paper) submitted by Archer, Darrell rejected on 04/20/2017 .
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Trial (& Mandatory Settlement Conference Dates) filed.
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Production of Documents) filed.
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Daniel V Kohls iso) filed.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of T xxxxxxxx iso) filed.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Dacia J Cenat iso) filed.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 08/05/2019 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Proposed Jury Instructions filed.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 08/06/2019 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 08/07/2019 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 08/08/2019 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Juror Questionnaire filed.
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 08/12/2019 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Verdict filed.
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Court Reporter Roster filed.
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions filed.
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Exhibit List (Plaintiff's Exhibit List) filed.
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Juror Questions filed.
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Exhibit List (Defendant's Exhibit List) filed.
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Response to Jury Question #1
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 08/13/2019 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by xxxxxxxx, xxxxxxx V rejected on 10/13/2020 .
Date: October 13, 2020Writ of Execution (Solano) Issued
Date: June 04, 2020Judgment on Verdict (Judgement on Jury Verdict Showing Costs Posted) filed.
Date: February 11, 2020Writ of Execution submitted by xxxxxxxx, xxxxxxx V; xxxxxxxx Law rejected on 10/01/2020 .
Date: October 01, 2020Writ of Execution submitted by xxxxxxxx, xxxxxxx V rejected on 11/06/2020 .
Date: November 06, 2020Writ of Execution submitted by xxxxxxxx, xxxxxxx V rejected on 12/14/2020 .
Date: December 14, 2020Summons - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Notice - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00CCCS - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00POS 010 - Change of Venue - Transfer in from Solano County Superior Court; Case Number: FCS047948
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.