Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fadaee Shayan, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Courtney John Kelley Esq., against David Moosari, Rasier-Ca Llc, Rasier Llc, Uber Technologies Inc, represented by Herzog Vanessa Kathryn, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County, CA, . Los Angeles County, CA Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: December 22, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 26, 2017NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION
Date: August 14, 2018RASIER, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 02, 2018RASIER-CA, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 02, 2018UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 02, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Mediation))
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Mediation))
Date: July 31, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2020)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Mediation) of 12/17/2020)
Date: December 17, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.