Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Garcia Rosa Miriam, Robles Rene, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Chapman Christofer R. Esq., against Blt Properties Inc, Strategic Sunrise Llc, represented by Daniels Fine Israel Schonbuck & Lebovits, Wang Tommy Songfong Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County, CA, . Los Angeles County, CA Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward L. Halm Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management111 days |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial475 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated (Non-Lead Case) |
Case Cycle Time229 days |
Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Conference Date Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Rosa Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff); Rene Robles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Strategic Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Conference Date Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Strategic Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Blt Properties, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Rosa Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff); Rene Robles (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Conference Date
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Steven J. Kleifield 9:30 am | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-03-08 00:00:00 | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Jury Trial Jury Trial |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Jury Trial |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Steven J. Kleifield 9:00 am | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-02-23 00:00:00 | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Final Status Conference Final Status Conference |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Final Status Conference |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Michael P. Linfield 8:35 am | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-10-17 00:00:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.