Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County, CA, . Los Angeles County, CA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
CASE NAME: COMMUNITY CORP. OF SANTA MONICA v. KENNE CASE NUMBER: 17SMUD01543 HEARING DATE: 11/7/18 TRIAL DATE: N/A NOTICE: OK __________________________________________________________________________...
Judge: Lawrence Cho |
|
September 13, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES WEST DISTRICT, SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE COMMUNITY CORPORATION ) Case No. 17SMUD01543 OF SANTA MONICA, ) Appellate Division Case No. BV032758 Plaintif...
Judge: Lawrence Cho |
|
August 09, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES WEST DISTRICT, SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE COMMUNITY CORPORATION ) Case No. 17SMUD01543 OF SANTA MONICA, ) Plaintiff, ) ) ORDER RE: COSTS AND ATTORNEY’S...
Judge: Lawrence Cho |
|
July 18, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
CASE NAME: COMMUNITY CORP. v. KENNE CASE NUMBER: 17SMUD01543 HEARING DATE: 7/18/18 TRIAL DATE: N/A TENTATIVE RULING MOTION: Plaintiff’s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting MSJ introduction Th...
Judge: Lawrence Cho |
|
April 30, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
CASE NAME: COMMUNITY CORP. v. KENNE CASE NUMBER: 17SMUD01543 HEARING DATE: 4/30/18 TRIAL DATE: 5/7/18 TENTATIVE RULING MOTION 1: Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication MOTION 2: Plaintif...
Judge: Lawrence Cho |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.