Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Zavala, Paul, filed a(n) 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case represented by Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt, against Donaghy Sales, Llc., represented by Ryan, Russell K., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County, CA, . Fresno County, CA Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Fresno with Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSimpson, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management64 days |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Fresno |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint document contains a lot of noise and invalid text from the extraction process. It is difficult to extract any meaningful information from it. There are no dollar amounts or violations of statutes mentioned in this document.
Summons issued and filed
Date: September 13, 2016Civil Complaint filed
Date: September 12, 2016Proof of Service
Date: October 17, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: September 13, 2016Civil case cover sheet
Date: September 12, 2016Notice Filed
Date: September 30, 2016Answer Filed
Date: October 28, 2016Declaration Filed
Date: April 26, 2017Opposition filed
Date: April 28, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: December 14, 2016Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: April 25, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: April 26, 2017Order Denied
Date: May 11, 2017Letter Received
Date: May 22, 2017ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: November 01, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 14, 2017Order Denied
Date: March 14, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 15, 2016Notice Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Notice Filed
Date: August 18, 2020Notice Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: February 01, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: August 18, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 27, 2021Opposition filed
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: July 26, 2021Proof of Service
Date: July 31, 2020Notice Filed
Date: July 27, 2021Order Granted
Date: September 14, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: February 06, 2019Amended Document Filed
Date: June 24, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: December 11, 2018Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: August 26, 2020Notice Filed
Date: November 23, 2020Notice Filed
Date: March 15, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 21, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: July 26, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 06, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: September 09, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 11, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: December 11, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: March 11, 2019Stipulation and Order filed
Date: March 14, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 26, 2018Notice Filed
Date: February 13, 2019Stipulation and Order filed
Date: July 26, 2017Motion filed
Date: December 11, 2018Notice Filed
Date: January 22, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: June 30, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 23, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: December 11, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: July 31, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 14, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: December 11, 2018Proof of Service
Date: January 29, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: July 31, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: June 28, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: July 31, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 28, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: June 15, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: August 06, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: February 01, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 21, 2018Notice Filed
Date: August 06, 2018Stipulation and Order filed
Date: September 17, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 05, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 03, 2020Notice Filed
Date: September 23, 2019Notice of Settlement filed
Date: February 27, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 24, 2020Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 17, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 26, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 26, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 04, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 13, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: April 26, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: June 09, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: June 05, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: June 05, 2017Statement filed
Date: June 05, 2017Opposition filed
Date: June 09, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 14, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: June 09, 2017Proof of Service
Date: June 09, 2017Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: June 22, 2017Proof of Service
Date: June 05, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: June 05, 2017Motion filed
Date: June 05, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: June 05, 2017Order Denied
Date: June 23, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: June 05, 2017Statement filed
Date: June 05, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: June 05, 2017Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: January 30, 2017Motion filed
Date: June 05, 2017Motion filed
Date: June 05, 2017Statement filed
Date: June 05, 2017Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: January 19, 2017Notice Filed
Date: May 09, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 26, 2017Stipulation and Order filed
Date: December 19, 2016Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: May 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2060 | Docket Event | Order Denied | |
April 24, 2060 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/2/22 Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed of Entry of Order |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Dismiss Filed 7/26/21 ~ Russel Ryan Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion - Dismiss | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granted To Dismiss For Failure to Bring Actio To Trial Within Five Years Pursuant to CCP 583.310 Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment & Certificate of Mailing |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant Donaghy Sales, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to CCP 583.310 |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.