Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hyneman, Donald Lee, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Andrew Kendall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew Kendall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Probate |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 | Hearing |
compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate
Judge: Kendall, Andrew B. |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate
Judge: Kendall, Andrew B. |
|
November 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Petition for Probate of Will READY FOR HEARING Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Probate of Will READY FOR HEARING Judge: Kendall, Andrew |
|
November 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Supplement Verified Supplement to Clear Notes Prior to Hearing |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplement Verified Supplement to Clear Notes Prior to Hearing |
|
November 09, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Publication | |
October 27, 2021 | Hearing | Request for Special Notice | |
October 21, 2021 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
October 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Petition to Administer Estate DE-121 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.