Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Langley, Kirstyn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Langley, Jacob, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cannon, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCannon, Gloria Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Parties ordered to appear at Mediation Conference. | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Substition of AttorneySubstition of Attorney |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Re Payment of Support | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution (Default) STATUS ENDS 6/21/22STATUS ENDS 6/21/22 |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appearance Stipulation and Waiver Appearance, Stipulations, and WaiversAppearance, Stipulations, and Waivers |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.