Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Iniguez, Christina, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Iniguez, Elvis Duran, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cannon, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCannon, Gloria Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 11/01/2021 PET DV/TRO Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 11/01/2021 PET DV/TRO Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
November 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Service TRO SERVED HRG 11/30/21 |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service TRO SERVED HRG 11/30/21 |
|
November 04, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Order Protecting Information of Minor | |
November 04, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) | |
November 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Temporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)
Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
November 03, 2021 | Hearing |
Request to Keep Minors Information Confidential DV-160 |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Keep Minors Information Confidential DV-160 |
|
November 02, 2021 | Hearing |
Order on Request to Keep Minors Information Confidential DV-165 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.