Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wren, Darian Michelle, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Banuelos, Cesar, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Webster, Jason W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWebster, Jason W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2021 | Hearing | Electronic Rejection Notice | |
November 10, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 09/29/2021 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 09/29/2021 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
November 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Mediation Appointment SET BY PET |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment SET BY PET |
|
October 29, 2021 | Hearing | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE: DV-200 | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE: DV-200 | |
October 07, 2021 | Hearing | Temporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) | |
October 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) GRANTED |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) GRANTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.