Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vallejo, Marissa Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rivera, Richard Adam, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bittleston, Dawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBittleston, Dawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/29/21 PET DV/TRO CONTD FROM 11/1/21 Judge: Azemika, Anthony |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/29/21 PET DV/TRO CONTD FROM 11/1/21 Judge: Azemika, Anthony |
|
November 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
November 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/29/21 PET DV/TRO Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/29/21 PET DV/TRO Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
October 28, 2021 | Hearing | Response to Temporary Restraining Order | |
October 18, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
September 30, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) | |
September 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Temporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.