Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Randolph, Evelyn Romayne, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Horton, Jeffery Sean, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Marquez, Raymonda B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Raymonda B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/29/21 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT, PETS, PROP CNTRL, DEBT, WIRELESS, CLASSES CONTD 11/18/21 1/20/22 Judge: Griffith, Donald B. |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/29/21 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT, PETS, PROP CNTRL, DEBT, WIRELESS, CLASSES CONTD 11/18/21 1/20/22 Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 25, 2022 | Hearing |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/29/21 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT, PETS, PROP CNTRL, DEBT, WIRELESS, CLASSES CONTD 11/18/21 Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/29/21 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT, PETS, PROP CNTRL, DEBT, WIRELESS, CLASSES CONTD 11/18/21 Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
November 30, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service | |
November 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Cervantes, Gina |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Cervantes, Gina |
|
November 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/29/21 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT, PETS, PROP CNTRL, DEBT, WIRELESS, CLASSES Judge: Cervantes, Gina |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.