Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Adrian Rea, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cecilia Ramos, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreen, Kenneth R., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Parties ordered to appear at Mediation Conference. | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Order (FL-300) | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS | |
October 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/27/21 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S ANGER MANAGEMENT CLASSES ADD LAST NAME TO SONS BIRTH CERTIFICATE 1 MINOR Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/27/21 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S ANGER MANAGEMENT CLASSES ADD LAST NAME TO SONS BIRTH CERTIFICATE 1 MINOR Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
October 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Mediation Appointment SET BY COURT |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment SET BY COURT |
|
September 30, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
September 27, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.