Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ringold, Larvinna, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hawkins, Timothy Jerome, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bittleston, Dawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBittleston, Dawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJune 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining OrderOrder |
|
April 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/27/21 PET DV/TRO NO SERVICE CONTD FROM 11/1/21, 12/6/21 & 2/7/22 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/27/21 PET DV/TRO NO SERVICE CONTD FROM 11/1/21, 12/6/21 & 2/7/22 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining | |
February 07, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/27/21 PET DV/TRO NO SERVICE CONTD FROM 11/1/21 & 12/6/21 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/27/21 PET DV/TRO NO SERVICE CONTD FROM 11/1/21 & 12/6/21 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
December 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining OrderOrder |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
December 06, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 9/27/21 PET DV/TRO NO SERVICE CONTD FROM 11/1/21 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.