Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Oliveros, Filiberto G, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Loo, Cynthia L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoo, Cynthia L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2021 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) 11/19/21 DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDRS 1 MINOR Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) 11/19/21 DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDRS 1 MINOR Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
December 14, 2021 | Hearing |
DCSS: Proof of Service by Mail E-FILED, NOM HRG: 01/27/2022 |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Proof of Service by Mail E-FILED, NOM HRG: 01/27/2022 |
|
November 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS E-FILED Re: 11/19/21 DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDRS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 01/27/22 Hearing Time: 08:00 Hearing Department/Division:A |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS E-FILED Re: 11/19/21 DCSS NOM JUDG CS HC STND ORDRS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 01/27/22 Hearing Time: 08:00 Hearing Department/Division:A |
|
October 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Answer to Complaint E-FILED BY KERN COUNTY DCSS |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint E-FILED BY KERN COUNTY DCSS |
|
October 18, 2021 | Hearing |
DCSS: Proof of Personal Service E-FILED |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Proof of Personal Service E-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.