Xxxxxx Xxxxx, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lunnon Xxxxxxx, represented by Norton Cathleen Elisabeth, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Marjorie S. Steinberg presiding.
Case Number(Subscribe to View) Track Case Changes |
JudgeMarjorie S. Steinberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions404 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time404 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice - Unavailability of Counsel (10/17/11-10/25/11, 11/22/11-11/25/11, 12/26/11-12/30/11 (respondent) ) | |
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment (Nullity ) | |
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 67, Juhas, Mark A., Presiding Short Cause Trial - Held - Order Made Judge: Mark A. |
|
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice - Ruling (respondent's ) | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 67, Juhas, Mark A., Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Trial Date Set Judge: Mark A. |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (petiitoner's ) | |
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: xxxxxx, xxxxx ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.