Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Gordin, Bat-Ami, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Garland, Mercedes, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 10, 2022 |
Category25-Cv Professional Negligence - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: November 02, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 18, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Trial T/E = 1 day Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial T/E = 1 day |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference CT = 06/03/24 T/E 1 day |
|
May 31, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference CT = 06/03/24 T/E 1 day Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 03/12/2024 Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC: 05/31/2024 // JT: 06/03/2024 // T/E: 1 day (D-H) -- reset from 05/03/24 per 03/12/24 Ruling |
|
May 01, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC: 05/31/2024 // JT: 06/03/2024 // T/E: 1 day (D-H) -- reset from 05/03/24 per 03/12/24 Ruling Judge: Friedman - Retired, Gary T. |
|
March 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Change Name/Address as to pro per plaintiff |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change Name/Address as to pro per plaintiff |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | scanner_abclaw_gmail_com_20240319_152136 | |
March 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Ruling 03/12/2024 Ruling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.