Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gabriel C. Rios, filed a(n) case against Ford Motor Company, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2022 |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Rios PLD ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2022Rios PLD DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: November 09, 2022Rios PLD NOT REMOVAL - STATE COURT
Date: November 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Rios PLD SOA - signed | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Rios PLD NOT REMOVAL - STATE COURT | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Rios PLD ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Rios PLD DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.