Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joanna Alvarez, Sergio Salazar, Sergio Santos, filed a(n) case against Taiomah Consuelo Muniz, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2022 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
ALVAREZ_JOANNA_SANTOS_SE_VIL_CASE_COVER_SHEET
Date: October 08, 2022ALVAREZ_JOANNA_SANTOS_SERGIO_LIT_PLD_SUMMONS
Date: October 08, 2022Joanna_Alvarez_fee
Date: October 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Alvarez CMC Stmt | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ALVAREZ_JOANNA_LIT_CF_CE_PROGRESS_DEFAULT_N1_ | |
October 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ALVAREZ_JOANNA_SANTOS_SE_VIL_CASE_COVER_SHEET | |
October 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ALVAREZ_JOANNA_SANTOS_SERGIO_LIT_PLD_SUMMONS | |
October 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Joanna_Alvarez_fee | |
October 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Sergio_Salazar_fee | |
October 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Sergio_Santos_Fee_ | |
October 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ALVAREZ_JOANNA_and_SANTO_WITH_CAUSE_OF_ACTION | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.