Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Elijah Pena, filed a(n) case against Islam Elgafy, Kayla Shelton, Taco Bros, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2022 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
civil_case
Date: October 07, 2022summons
Date: October 07, 2022138687_COMPLAINT_2
Date: October 07, 2022FW_2
Date: October 07, 2022POS_Taco_Bros_Inc_
Date: October 31, 2022FINAL Certificate of Progress for 12-7-22
Date: December 07, 2022FINAL Answer to Complaint
Date: January 06, 2023138687_Notice_of_Settlem_e_Case_signed_signed
Date: March 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | 138687_Notice_of_Settlem_e_Case_signed_signed | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL Answer to Complaint | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL Certificate of Progress for 12-7-22 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | POS_Islam_Elgafy | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | POS_Taco_Bros_Inc_ | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | civil_case | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | summons | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | 138687_COMPLAINT_2 | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FW_2 | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.