Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Alvarado, Kimi, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ramirez, April, against Fastrip Food Stores, Inc., represented by Waldon, Grover H, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Zulfa, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZulfa, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Kimi Alvarado against Fastrip Food Stores, Inc. and Does 1 to 50. The complaint alleges personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The jurisdiction of the case is the Superior Court of California...
Further Case Management Conference
Date: March 14, 2024Further Case Management Conference
Date: January 18, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: October 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2025 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 7DAYS ALL PARTIES JT Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
May 19, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E 7DAYS ALL PARTIES JT |
|
May 09, 2025 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 5/19/25 T/E 7DAYS |
|
May 09, 2025 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 5/19/25 T/E 7DAYS Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 04/22/24 0930 DIV. J T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 04/22/24 0930 DIV. J T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 4/22/2024 in Div J- Time Estimate 7 Days |
|
March 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 4/22/2024 in Div J- Time Estimate 7 Days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.