Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Redd, Michael, Super Center Concepts, Inc., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by De Soto, Daniel A, Jamsheed, Kate, Ostoia, Adina A, against American Guard Services, Inc., Bernal, David, Super Center Concepts, Inc., Worldwide Sourcing Group, Inc., represented by Britton, Aaron L, Trachtman, Marc A, Vander Werf, Christina M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Management Conference
Date: March 27, 2023Ruling
Date: March 06, 2024Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: May 13, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 03/22/2024 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 as to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed 05/01/23, ONLY |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial **as to cross-complaint ONLY** -- T/E = 5-7 days Jury for plaintiff and defendant. Plaintiff to post jury fees |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E = 5-7 days Jury for plaintiff and defendant. Plaintiff to post jury fees |
|
May 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E = 5-7 days Jury for plaintiff and defendant. Plaintiff to post jury fees Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference **as to cross-complaint ONLY** -- JT = 05/06/23 T/E 5-7 days |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT = 05/06/23 T/E 5-7 days |
|
May 03, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT = 05/06/23 T/E 5-7 days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 03/06/2024 Mandatory Settlement Conference **as to cross-complaint ONLY** - FCMC: 05/03/2024 // JT: 05/06/2024 // T/E: 5-7 DAYS (D-H) |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 03/06/2024 Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC: 05/03/2024 // JT: 05/06/2024 // T/E: 5-7 DAYS (D-H) |
|
April 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC: 05/03/2024 // JT: 05/06/2024 // T/E: 5-7 DAYS (D-H) Judge: Zulfa, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.