Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Juan Gonzalez, filed a(n) case against Jose Carrillo, Oscar Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
65902Answe0008ec
Date: November 03, 202265902Deman01e4dd
Date: November 03, 202266311Misce00d611
Date: November 11, 202269921Notic0053c7
Date: January 27, 202371722CaseM007ca7
Date: March 02, 202317. Pltf's CMS
Date: March 03, 202318. Pltf's Ntc of Jury Fees
Date: March 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 17. Pltf's CMS | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 18. Pltf's Ntc of Jury Fees | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 71722CaseM007ca7 | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 69921Notic0053c7 | |
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | 66311Misce00d611 | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 65902Answe0008ec | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 65902Deman01e4dd | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/04/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/04/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17 |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.