Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Doolan, Lena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Geoulla, Daniel D, against Harding, Rob, Kern River Family Mortuary, Lori &Amp; Harding Inc, Sharp, Stephen Glen, represented by Bernhardt, Victoria R, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2022 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Lena Doolan against Kern River Family Mortuary, Stephen Glen Sharp, Rob Harding, and Does 1 to 100. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants,...
Order to Show Cause
Date: February 16, 2022FW003 17750 Flat
Date: February 12, 2022Summons 17750
Date: February 12, 2022CM010 17750 Sgned
Date: February 12, 2022Complaint 17750 Signed
Date: February 12, 2022Doolan_v_Kern_River_Mort_AINT_served_6_30_22_
Date: July 01, 2022Doolan_v_Kern_River_Mort_OSIT_served_6_30_22_
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Settlement 1.4.24
Date: January 05, 2024Doolan_v_Kern_River_Mort_CMC_SERVED_7_22_22_
Date: July 22, 2022P CMS 08-15-2022
Date: July 27, 2022POS Kern River Family Mortuary
Date: July 27, 2022POS Rob Harding - Registered Owner
Date: July 27, 2022P Resp to OSC re Service
Date: July 27, 2022P CMS 12-14
Date: November 22, 2022Doolan_v_Kern_River_Mort_TEMENT_12_14_22_CMC_
Date: December 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/05/2024 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 |
|
February 21, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 8 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. (CONFIRM PLTFF POSTED J/F) ** Needs reassignment to Judge Zulfa notice ** |
|
February 13, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E: 8 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. (CONFIRM PLTFF POSTED J/F) ** Needs reassignment to Judge Zulfa notice ** Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 02/13/24 9:30 A.M. IN DIV. J T/E: 8 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. (CONFIRM PLTFF POSTED J/F) ** Needs reassignment to Judge Zulfa notice ** |
|
February 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 02/13/24 9:30 A.M. IN DIV. J T/E: 8 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. (CONFIRM PLTFF POSTED J/F) ** Needs reassignment to Judge Zulfa notice ** Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Div. J. FCMC 2/9/24. Trial 2/13/24. T/E 8 DAYS |
|
January 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Div. J. FCMC 2/9/24. Trial 2/13/24. T/E 8 DAYS Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/05/2024 Ruling |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement 1.4.24 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.