Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Donald Hollingsworth, Donald Hollingsworth, Individually And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, Lutricia Randolph, Lutricia Randolph, On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Campbell, Jessica L, against Westcare California, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Zulfa, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZulfa, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2022 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
53188Compl00aee4
Date: February 09, 202253188State031845
Date: February 09, 202253188Summo019b58
Date: February 09, 202253235Civil008fcf
Date: February 09, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: February 09, 202255285PROOF005579
Date: March 25, 202256040Defen0036a2
Date: April 11, 202256430FIRST0091d8
Date: April 19, 202258053DEFEN00ad57
Date: May 23, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 09, 202260844CaseM00767f
Date: July 25, 202260895CaseM0068a2
Date: July 25, 202269678CaseM002b98
Date: January 23, 2023Ntc of Entry of Order and Judgment
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) Re: Compliance re: settlement administration. Judge: Zulfa, David |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Ntc of Entry of Order and Judgment | |
October 26, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment of Order and Judgment Re Final Approval of Class Action Settlement |
|
October 26, 2023 | Hearing |
Order Granting Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Entering Judgment Judge: Zulfa, David |
|
October 23, 2023 | Hearing |
Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement Set from 06/22/23 (Prelim Motion granted) Judge: Zulfa, David |
|
September 27, 2023 | Hearing | Proof of Service re: Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and related docs | |
September 27, 2023 | Hearing | DECLARATION OF LUTRICIA RANDOLPH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT | |
September 27, 2023 | Hearing | DECLARATION OF NICK CASTRO OF ILYM GROUP, INC., IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT | |
September 27, 2023 | Hearing | DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF DONALD HOLLINGSWORTH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT | |
September 27, 2023 | Hearing | DECLARATION OF ROSS E. SHANBERG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.