Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martinez, Ruben, Iii, Martinez, Yvonne, Ruben Martinez, By And Through His Successor In Interest, Yvonne Martinez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Hutchins, Joanna A, against Parkview Julian, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBradshaw, J. Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2022 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
52779Compl009d17
Date: January 31, 202252779Summo01853c
Date: January 31, 202252779Civil0371f9
Date: January 31, 202252779Decla020ad6
Date: January 31, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: February 02, 202257685Proof008ac5
Date: May 16, 202260319Notic01974f
Date: July 13, 202260319DEFEN0083c6
Date: July 13, 202260385Notic0128e1
Date: July 14, 202260384CaseM00f6d4
Date: July 14, 202260385CaseM00f84f
Date: July 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 60385Notic0128e1 | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 60384CaseM00f6d4 | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 60385CaseM00f84f | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 60319Notic01974f | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 60319DEFEN0083c6 | |
May 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | 57685Proof008ac5 | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/18/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
February 02, 2022 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.