Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Smith, Nathan F, against County Of San Bernardino Department Of Child Support Services, A Government Agency, Demmon, Crystal, Gonzales, Aimee Kathrina, Gonzales, Antonio Robert, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBradshaw, J. Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2022 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 17, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 31, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: January 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | UD134993`memo | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | UD134993 writ | |
August 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued COUNTY OF KERN |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued COUNTY OF KERN |
|
July 28, 2023 | Hearing |
Memorandum of Costs AFTER JUDGMENT |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs AFTER JUDGMENT |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | OC142491.5434293.23 | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | OC142491.5434294.23 | |
September 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued Writ of Sale; County of Kern |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued Writ of Sale; County of Kern |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.