Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Illinois Midwest Insurance Agency, Llc, On Behalf Of Procentury Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Malek, Jeffrey L, against Villatoro, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBradshaw, J. Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CW424057.940065.POS of Summons (Villatoro)
Date: January 11, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: October 01, 2021endo0489
Date: February 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | UYU | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CW438633 NTC OF SE | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CW438633 NOTICE OF CH | |
March 30, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CW432182.981453.2022-3-14 CMS (final) | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CW431866.979368.2022-3-10 CMS (final) | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ENDO1423a | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ENDO1423b | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | endo0489 | |
January 14, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.