Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Xxxxx, Xxxxxx, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2021 |
Category43-Nc Name Change - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Petition for Change of Name
Date: December 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name 12/13/2021 Petition for Change of Name 1 MINOR Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Petition for Change of Name 1 MINOR Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Service AS TO ELIAS ANTONIO xxxxx |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service AS TO ELIAS ANTONIO xxxxx |
|
November 10, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Publication Published in the DAILY REPORT |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Published in the DAILY REPORT |
|
October 13, 2021 | Hearing |
CLETS Check Returned KCSO cleared fro hearing. |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLETS Check Returned KCSO cleared fro hearing. |
|
October 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Request for CLETS Report SENT TO KCSO |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for CLETS Report SENT TO KCSO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.