Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Baylon, Linda, Flores, Catherine, Miclat, Ana, Quinones, Jorge, Tomas, Eribertha, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hubbard, Roger M., against Lindley, Jason, Rhoads, Julia, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateJune 22, 2017 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time133 days |
Order to Show Cause
Date: June 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
November 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Dismissal, directed to Plaintiffs' counsel to show cause why the Court should not dismiss any/all unserved parties pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 (Set per MO 10/05/17) Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Dismissal, directed to Plaintiffs' counsel to show cause why the Court should not dismiss any/all unserved parties pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 (Set per MO 10/05/17) Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
November 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice as to the entire action of all parties and all causes of action |
|
November 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Response to OSC |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response to OSC |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice as to the entire action of all parties and all causes of action |
|
October 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Order to Appear and Show Cause |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order to Appear and Show Cause |
|
October 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.