Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Berchtold, Thomas, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Haddad, Ammen, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateJune 08, 2017 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions105 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
October 04, 2017 | Hearing | Mail Returned Undelivered | |
September 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) without prejudice Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
September 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) without prejudice Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
June 26, 2017 | Hearing | Mail Returned Undelivered | |
June 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Summons Issued and Filed RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN (B) |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN (B) |
|
June 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted AS TO THOMAS BERCHTOLD Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted AS TO THOMAS BERCHTOLD Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.