Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mitchell, Antoinette, Mitchell, Dennis, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Cole, David A, against Buehler Family Bakersfield, Llc, Buehler, Marilyn Irene, Buehler, Marlyn Irene, Flo-Rene Dix Black Welder, represented by Young, Paul Philip, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateMay 24, 2017 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time107 days |
Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16
Date: August 09, 2017Ruling
Date: August 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2018 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment | |
December 12, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Order | |
December 12, 2017 | Hearing | Electronic Rejection Notice | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
December 08, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes | |
December 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Order [Amended] Order granting defendant buehler Family Bakersfield, LLC; Florene Dix Blackwelder and Marilyn Irene Buehlers' Motion for attorney fees and cost pursuant to ccp 425.16(c)(1) Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order [Amended] Order granting defendant buehler Family Bakersfield, LLC; Florene Dix Blackwelder and Marilyn Irene Buehlers' Motion for attorney fees and cost pursuant to ccp 425.16(c)(1) Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
November 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
October 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition) 8/31/17 Defendants Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs ResID: 25656 ************************************************** TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION. ****************************************************** Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.